EP0163089 - Process for activating a substrate for electroless deposition of a conductive metal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1989 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1989 [1989/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Gerald Walter 1112 Reynolds Road Johnson City New York 13790 / US | 02 /
Lawrence, William Howell Rd 3 Box 228 Greene New York 13778 / US | 03 /
Rovente, Frederick Michael Rd 2 Binghamton New York 13903 / US | [1985/49] | Representative(s) | Kreidler, Eva-Maria Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | Kreidler, Eva-Maria, Dr. rer. nat. Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104589.8 | 17.04.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | US19840603791 | 25.04.1984 Original published format: US 603791 | [1985/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0163089 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0163089 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163089 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/18, G03F7/02, C23C18/16 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
G03F7/095 (EP);
H05K3/048 (EP);
H05K3/184 (EP);
H05K2203/0577 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aktivieren eines Trägers für stromlose leitfähige Metallabscheidung | [1985/49] | English: | Process for activating a substrate for electroless deposition of a conductive metal | [1985/49] | French: | Procédé d'activation d'un substrat en vue du dépôt sans courant d'un métal conducteur | [1985/49] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/18] | 24.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1191215 ; | [A]US3672925 ; | [A]EP0002795 |