EP0159669 - Device for inserting and maintaining a closure on a rigid body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAUL JOURNEE S.A. 39, Avenue Marceau F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1985/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Filaine, Roger Immeuble le Fossé Vert, Appt. 1739 F-27140 Gisors / FR | 02 /
Karabowicz, Jean 2, rue de Picardie F-95100 Argenteuil / FR | 03 /
Percebois, Serge 23, Résidence Bellevue F-60240 Chaumont-en-Vexin / FR | [1985/44] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104703.5 | 18.04.1985 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | FR19840006652 | 27.04.1984 Original published format: FR 8406652 | [1985/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0159669 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0159669 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159669 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/00 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
B60K15/0406 (EP);
B60K2015/0445 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einsetzen und Haltern eines Verschlusses auf einem festen Rumpf | [1985/44] | English: | Device for inserting and maintaining a closure on a rigid body | [1985/44] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'une fermeture sur un corps rigide | [1985/44] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 16.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3580414 ; | [A]DE2357789 ; | [A]GB2026452 ; | [A]US1476566 |