EP0159684 - (6,11-Dihydro-11-oxodibenz(b,e)oxepinyl)pentanoic acids and derivatives, a process and intermediates for their preparation and their use as medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Route 202-206 North Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Route 202-206 North Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Lawrence L. R.D.3, Concord Road Box 81 Lebanon New Jersey 08833 / US | 02 /
Setescak, Linda L. Kimberly Road 102 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | [1985/44] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, et al Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partners LLP Franklinstrasse 61-63 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr., et al Hoechst AG, Werk Kalle-Albert, Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104829.8 | 20.04.1985 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | US19840604672 | 27.04.1984 Original published format: US 604672 | [1985/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0159684 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0159684 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159684 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D313/12, C07C69/76, A61K31/335 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
C07D313/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07C65/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/44] | Title | German: | (6,11-Dihydro-11-oxodibenz[b,e]oxepinyl)-Pentaansäuren und Derivate, Verfahren und Zwischenprodukte zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung als Arzneimittel | [1985/44] | English: | (6,11-Dihydro-11-oxodibenz(b,e)oxepinyl)pentanoic acids and derivatives, a process and intermediates for their preparation and their use as medicaments | [1985/44] | French: | Acides(6,11-dihydro-11-oxodibenzo[b,e]oxépinyl)-pentanoiques et dérivés, un procédé et des intermédiaires pour leur préparation et leur emploi comme médicaments | [1985/44] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 29.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.04.1990 | GB | 20.04.1990 | SE | 21.04.1990 | BE | 30.04.1990 | CH | 30.04.1990 | LI | 30.04.1990 | LU | 30.04.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/49] | AT | 20.04.1990 | |
GB | 20.04.1990 | ||
SE | 21.04.1990 | ||
BE | 30.04.1990 | ||
CH | 30.04.1990 | ||
LI | 30.04.1990 | ||
Former [1991/34] | GB | 20.04.1990 | |
SE | 21.04.1990 | ||
BE | 30.04.1990 | ||
CH | 30.04.1990 | ||
LI | 30.04.1990 | ||
Former [1991/32] | GB | 20.04.1990 | |
SE | 21.04.1990 | ||
CH | 30.04.1990 | ||
LI | 30.04.1990 | ||
Former [1991/30] | GB | 20.04.1990 | |
SE | 21.04.1990 | ||
Former [1991/12] | SE | 21.04.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2319339 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]DE2716230 (HOECHST AG) |