EP0164537 - Joining of highly wear-resistant plates, especially ceramic plates, to a support to be protected against wear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Partz, Klaus-Dieter, Dr. Karl-Huschens-Strasse 17 D-5653 Leichlingen / DE | [1985/51] | Representative(s) | Beisner, Klaus, et al c/o Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz AG Patenwesen PR-P D-51057 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | Beisner, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz AG Patenwesen PR-P D-51057 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104996.5 | 25.04.1985 | [1985/51] | Priority number, date | DE19843422097 | 14.06.1984 Original published format: DE 3422097 | [1985/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164537 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164537 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164537 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C04B37/02, B23K35/00, B04B1/20 | [1985/51] | CPC: |
C04B37/026 (EP,US);
B04B1/2008 (EP,US);
B23K35/001 (EP,US);
C04B2237/12 (EP,US);
C04B2237/32 (EP,US);
C04B2237/406 (EP,US);
C04B2237/407 (EP,US);
C04B2237/72 (EP,US);
C04B2237/76 (EP,US);
C04B2237/86 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/51] | Title | German: | Verbindung von hochverschleissfesten Platten, insbesondere Keramikplatten, mit einem vor Verschleiss zu schützendem Träger | [1985/51] | English: | Joining of highly wear-resistant plates, especially ceramic plates, to a support to be protected against wear | [1985/51] | French: | Liaison de plaques très résistantes à l'usure, en particulier de plaques céramiques, à un support devant être protégé contre l'usure | [1985/51] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 09.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4003115 (FISHER WILLIAM F); | [Y]EP0038584 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [Y]DE2417478 (DEUTSCHE BUNDESPOST); | [Y]EP0038072 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]); | [AD]CH221365 (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG [DE]); | [A]DE2165696 (BRITISH LEYLAND TRUCK & BUS) |