EP0168564 - Mixing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.1990 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herfeld, Ute Wall 1 D-58809 Neuenrade / DE | [1987/44] |
Former [1986/04] | For all designated states Herfeld, Friedrich Walter, Dr. Wall 1 D-58809 Neuenrade / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herfeld, Friedrich Walter, Dr. Verstorben / DE | [1987/44] |
Former [1986/04] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Volkmar Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur. Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85105031.0 | 25.04.1985 | [1986/04] | Priority number, date | DE19843426159 | 16.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3426159 | [1986/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0168564 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0168564 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0168564 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01F7/02 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
B01F27/808 (EP,US);
B01F33/35 (EP,US);
B01F35/3213 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/04] | Title | German: | Mischvorrichtung | [1986/04] | English: | Mixing device | [1986/04] | French: | Mélangeur | [1986/04] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 12.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/37] | 21.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2110047 ; | [Y]DE960269 (ARMINIUS MASCHB ARNDT & BRINKM); | [A]DE3112685 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER [DE]); | [A]DE2735102 (SCHREINER ERNST) |