Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0648722B | 22.06.1994 | B2 | JPS60229366 | 14.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8561784 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0648723B | 22.06.1994 | B2 | JPS60229367 | 14.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8561884 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS61131547 | 19.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25302784 | 30.11.1984 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS61131558 | 19.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25302684 | 30.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0163132 | Global Dossier | 15.03.1989 | B1 | EP0163132 | 04.12.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP8561784 | 27.04.1984 | JP8561884 | 27.04.1984 | JP25302684 | 30.11.1984 | JP25302784 | 30.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3568911D1 | 20.04.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP8561784 | 27.04.1984 | JP8561884 | 27.04.1984 | JP25302684 | 30.11.1984 | JP25302784 | 30.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR890004458B | 04.11.1989 | B1 | KR850007718 | 07.12.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8561784 | 27.04.1984 | JP8561884 | 27.04.1984 | JP25302684 | 30.11.1984 | JP25302784 | 30.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4710897 | 01.12.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8561784 | 27.04.1984 | JP8561884 | 27.04.1984 | JP25302684 | 30.11.1984 | JP25302784 | 30.11.1984 |