EP0163132 - A semiconductor memory device comprising a matrix of six-transistor memory cells with a pair of CMOS inverters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/49] | A semiconductor memory device comprised of sex-transistor memory cell with a pair of CMOS inverters | ||
[1989/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.1990 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masuoka, Fujio c/o Patent Division K.K. Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Ochii, Kiyofumi c/o Patent Division K.K. Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1989/11] |
Former [1985/49] | 01 /
Masuoka, Fujio c/o Patent Division K.K. toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | ||
02 /
Ochii, Kiyofumi c/o Patent Division K.K. toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85105039.3 | 25.04.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | JP19840085617 | 27.04.1984 Original published format: JP 8561784 | JP19840085618 | 27.04.1984 Original published format: JP 8561884 | JP19840253026 | 30.11.1984 Original published format: JP 25302684 | JP19840253027 | 30.11.1984 Original published format: JP 25302784 | [1985/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0163132 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163132 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/10, H01L23/52, G11C11/40 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
H01L23/53271 (EP,US);
H10B10/12 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/32155 (KR);
H01L21/76838 (KR);
H01L27/092 (KR);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10S257/903 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/49] | Title | German: | Aus einer sechs-Transistor-Speicherzelle mit zwei CMOS-Invertern bestehende Halbleiter-Speichervorrichtung | [1985/49] | English: | A semiconductor memory device comprising a matrix of six-transistor memory cells with a pair of CMOS inverters | [1989/11] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteur comprenant une cellule de mémoire à six transistors à deux inverseurs CMOS | [1985/49] |
Former [1985/49] | A semiconductor memory device comprised of sex-transistor memory cell with a pair of CMOS inverters | Examination procedure | 25.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/49] | 20.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5661158 ; | [A]DE3002343 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [A]WO8102222 (MOSTEK CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0098737 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) |