EP0161598 - Radar system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jehle, Franz, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Fünf Bäume Weg 148 D-7900 Ulm/Donau / DE | 02 /
Mutschler, Jürgen, Dr.-Ing. Soldatenstrasse 14 D-7900 Ulm/Donau / DE | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | Schulze, Harald Rudolf, et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | Schulze, Harald Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 85105464.3 | 04.05.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | DE19843417073 | 09.05.1984 Original published format: DE 3417073 | [1985/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0161598 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161598 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/28 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
G01S13/282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/47] | Title | German: | Radaranordnung | [1985/47] | English: | Radar system | [1985/47] | French: | Dispositif radar | [1985/47] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 03.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1989/39] | BE | 31.05.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SONICS AND ULTRASONICS, Band SU-20, Nr. 2, April 1973, Seiten 94-104, New York, US; H.M. GERARD u.a.: "The design and applications of highly dispersive acoustic surface-wave filters" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, Band 52, Nr. 4, April 1964, Seiten 377-389, New York, US; C.E. COOK u.a.: "A pulse compression predistortion function for efficient sidelobe reduction in a high-power radar" | [A] - IRE TRANSACTIONS ON MILITARY ELECTRONICS, Band MIL-6, Nr. 2, April 1962, Seiten 162-169, New York, US; C.L. THEMES: "Sidelobe suppression in a range-channel pulse-compression radar" |