EP0163179 - Menstrual tampon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vereinigte Papierwerke AG Schoppershofstrasse 80 D-8500 Nürnberg 1 / DE | [1987/02] |
Former [1986/29] | For all designated states Vereinigte Papierwerke Schickedanz & Co. Schoppershofstrasse 50 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sustmann, Scarlet, Dr. Am Nachtigallenwäldchen D-4060 Viersen / DE | [1985/49] | Representative(s) | Pohl, Hans Ludwig Hefnersplatz 3 8500 Nürnberg 11 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | Pohl, Hans Ludwig Hefnersplatz 3 D-8500 Nürnberg 11 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85105736.4 | 10.05.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | DE19843418521 | 18.05.1984 Original published format: DE 3418521 | [1985/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0163179 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/00, A01N25/10, A01N59/20 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
A61L15/46 (EP,US);
A61L2300/102 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
Y10S604/904 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/28, C08L1/26, C08L1/20, C08L1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/49] | Title | German: | Menstrualtampon | [1985/49] | English: | Menstrual tampon | [1985/49] | French: | Tampon menstruel | [1985/49] | File destroyed: | 21.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 01.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/28] | 03.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1540077 (PHILIPS NV); | [X]FR1499358 (MO TEKSTILNY I); | [X]FR1499788 (MO TEXTILNY I); | [A]US2856330 (VAGENIUS HAROLD N); | [AD]GB2083748 (LANDSTINGENS INKOPSCENTRAL) |