EP0168576 - A brake booster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Messersmith, William K. 1702 Belmont Avenue South Bend Indiana 46615 / US | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | Brullé, Jean, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | Brullé, Jean, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 85105751.3 | 10.05.1985 | [1986/04] | Priority number, date | US19840627176 | 02.07.1984 Original published format: US 627176 | [1986/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0168576 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/14 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
B60T13/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/04] | Title | German: | Bremskraftverstärker | [1986/04] | English: | A brake booster | [1986/04] | French: | Amplificateur de freinage | [1986/04] | File destroyed: | 21.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 23.09.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/14] | 21.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2086509 ; | [A]GB2001721 ; | [A]GB2121897 ; | [AD]US4441319 ; | [A]US2964909 ; | [AD]GB2140519 |