EP0161645 - Contact glass for ophthalmoscopy and laser beam ophthalmotherapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/47] | Contact glass for ophthalmoscopy and laser beam ophthalmo therapy | ||
[1988/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LASAG AG Steffisburgstrasse 1 CH-3600 Thun / CH | [1985/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rol, Pascal Résidence du Lac Staatstrasse 73 CH-3654 Gunten / CH | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | Gresset, Jean, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Gresset, Jean, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [1987/16] | Gresset, Jean, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [1985/47] | Gresset, Jean ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 85105758.8 | 10.05.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | FR19840007835 | 17.05.1984 Original published format: FR 8407835 | [1985/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0161645 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161645 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/00, A61B3/00 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
A61F9/009 (EP,US);
A61B3/117 (EP,US);
G02C7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1985/47] | Title | German: | Kontaktglas für Ophthalmoskopie und Laserstrahlen-Ophthalmotherapie | [1985/47] | English: | Contact glass for ophthalmoscopy and laser beam ophthalmotherapy | [1988/04] | French: | Verre de contact pour l'ophtalmoscopie et l'ophtalmotherapie par rayons laser | [1985/47] |
Former [1985/47] | Contact glass for ophthalmoscopy and laser beam ophthalmo therapy | Examination procedure | 01.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 23.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2304315 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]); | [A]US4033679 (SUSSMAN WALTER); | [AD]EP0059159 (LASAG AG [CH]); | [A]EP0092513 (LASAG AG [CH]) |