EP0165483 - Process for the manufature of acid nitro dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hertel, Hasso, Dr. Brunnenweg 10 D-6052 Mühlheim/Main / DE | [1985/52] | Application number, filing date | 85106114.3 | 18.05.1985 | [1985/52] | Priority number, date | DE19843419394 | 24.05.1984 Original published format: DE 3419394 | [1985/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0165483 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0165483 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0165483 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C09B51/00, D06P3/32 | [1985/52] | CPC: |
C09B51/00 (EP);
D06P3/3206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von sauren Nitrofarbstoffen | [1985/52] | English: | Process for the manufature of acid nitro dyes | [1985/52] | French: | Procédé de préparation de colorants nitrés acides | [1985/52] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 17.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 17.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.11.1988 | GB | 30.11.1988 | IT | 30.11.1988 | CH | 31.05.1989 | LI | 31.05.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/03] | GB | 30.11.1988 | |
IT | 30.11.1988 | ||
CH | 31.05.1989 | ||
LI | 31.05.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.11.1988 | |
CH | 31.05.1989 | ||
LI | 31.05.1989 | ||
Former [1990/18] | CH | 31.05.1989 | |
LI | 31.05.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | GB1468478 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | EP0126378 [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]); | DE3330948 [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]) |