EP0163248 - Spinning manifold for melt-spinning synthetic fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B a r m a g AG Postfach 11 02 40 D-42862 Remscheid / DE | [1987/11] |
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states b a r m a g Barmer Maschinenfabrik Aktiengesellschaft Leverkuser Strasse 65 Postfach 110 240 D-5630 Remscheid 11 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenk, Erich, Dr.-Ing. Semmelweisstrasse 4 D-5630 Remscheid 11 / DE | 02 /
Feth, Max Föhrenstrasse 21 D-5630 Remscheid / DE | [1985/49] | Representative(s) | Pfingsten, Dieter Krienen Pfingsten Trusowski Königstrasse 49 42853 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | Pfingsten, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Barmag AG Postfach 11 02 40 D-42862 Remscheid / DE | ||
Former [1985/49] | Pfingsten, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Barmag AG, Postfach 11 02 40 D-42862 Remscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 85106256.2 | 22.05.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | DE19843419772 | 26.05.1984 Original published format: DE 3419772 | DE19843428786 | 04.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3428786 | DE19843423087 | 22.06.1984 Original published format: DE 3423087 | DE19843426211 | 17.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3426211 | [1985/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0163248 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0163248 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163248 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D01D4/00, D01D4/06 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
D01D4/06 (EP);
D01D4/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/49] | Title | German: | Spinnbalken zum Schmelzspinnen synthetischer Fäden | [1985/49] | English: | Spinning manifold for melt-spinning synthetic fibres | [1985/49] | French: | Bloc de filage pour le filage au fondu de fibres synthétiques | [1985/49] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 16.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH533693 (DU PONT CANADA [CA]); | [XP]DE8407945U ; | [AD]LU60314 ; | [AD]DE1966565 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF); | [A]DE2639282 (NEUMUENSTER MASCH APP) | Examination | EP0155835 |