EP0164061 - Optical disk exclusively used for reproduction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiraoka, Shigehiko 18-321, Uenohigashi-2-chome Toyonaka-shi / JP | 02 /
Ichinose, Makoto 4-3-303, Harayamadai-1-cho Sakai-shi / JP | 03 /
Satoh, Isao 36-12, Naritahigashigaoka Neyagawa-shi / JP | 04 /
Sugimura, Tatuo 1-6-603, Kazurugaoka-2-chome Kogamachi Kasuya-gun Fukuoka-ken / JP | [1985/50] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/50] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85106593.8 | 29.05.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | JP19840113294 | 01.06.1984 Original published format: JP 11329484 | JP19840113308 | 01.06.1984 Original published format: JP 11330884 | JP19840115002 | 05.06.1984 Original published format: JP 11500284 | [1985/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0164061 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164061 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/007 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
G11B7/24085 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/50] | Title | German: | Optische Platte ausschliesslich zur Wiedergabe | [1985/50] | English: | Optical disk exclusively used for reproduction | [1985/50] | French: | Disque optique exclusivement de reproduction | [1985/50] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 30.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/28] | 23.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5740760 ; | [A]JP57141030 ; | [Y]EP0054438 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [AP]WO8404990 (STORAGE TECHNOLOGY PARTNERS [US]); | [A]WO8001328 (NCR CO [US]); | [A]EP0081138 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4420828 (YOSHIDA TOMIO [JP], et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 112, 23 June 1982, page (P-124)(990); & JP-A-57-40760 (TOKYO SHIBAURA) 06-03-1982, & JP5740760 A 19820623 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 241, 30 November 1982, page (P-158)(1119); & JP-A-57-141030 (MATSUSHITA)01-09-1982, & JP57141030 A 19821130 |