EP0195841 - Quinolinecarboxylic acid derivatives and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/40] | For all designated states KYORIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. No. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irakura, Tsutomu No. 10-28, Ooizumigakuen-cho 7-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Suzue, Seigo No. 13-4, Aoba 4-chome Kuki-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Murayama, Satoshi No. 6095, Tomonuma Nogi-machi Simotsuga-gun Tochigi-ken / JP | 04 /
Hirai, Keiji No. 1-2-512, Aoba 1-chome Kuki-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 05 /
Ishizaki, Takayoshi No. 9-6, Sakurada 4-chome Washimiya-machi Kitakatsushika-gun Saitama-ken / JP | [1986/40] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/40] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85106626.6 | 29.05.1985 | [1986/40] | Priority number, date | JP19850046216 | 08.03.1985 Original published format: JP 4621685 | [1986/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195841 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/56, A61K31/495 | [1986/40] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP);
C07D401/00 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/40] | Title | German: | Chinolincarbonsäurederivate und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1986/40] | English: | Quinolinecarboxylic acid derivatives and process for their preparation | [1986/40] | French: | Dérivés d'acide quinolinecarboxylique et leur procédé de préparation | [1986/40] | File destroyed: | 21.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 02.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/48] | 01.07.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2057440 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]); | [Y]BE899399 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK); | [E]EP0167763 (BAYER AG [DE]) |