blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0170818

EP0170818 - Implant for the jaw for receiving a dental prosthesis bracket [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.1988
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Feldmühle Aktiengesellschaft
Fritz-Vomfelde-Platz 4
D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE
[1986/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Plischka, Gerhard, Dr.med.
Eckertstrasse 113
A-8020 Graz / AT
[1986/07]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[1986/34]
Former [1986/07]Uhlmann, Hans, Dr. rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem.
Hofstrasse 83
D-41747 Viersen / DE
Application number, filing date85106974.005.06.1985
[1986/07]
Priority number, dateDE1984342105606.06.1984         Original published format: DE 3421056
[1986/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0170818
Date:12.02.1986
Language:DE
[1986/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0170818
Date:07.01.1988
Language:DE
[1988/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.1985
ClassificationIPC:A61C8/00
[1986/07]
CPC:
A61C8/0075 (EP,US); A61C8/0022 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/07]
TitleGerman:Kieferimplantat zur Aufnahme eines Zahnersatzträgers[1986/07]
English:Implant for the jaw for receiving a dental prosthesis bracket[1986/07]
French:Implant pour mâchoire destiné à la réception d'un support de prothèse dentaire[1986/07]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure03.02.1986Examination requested  [1986/15]
26.03.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
13.07.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.1987Fee for grant paid
20.08.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.10.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT07.01.1988
NL07.01.1988
SE31.01.1988
LU30.06.1988
[2007/44]
Former [1999/52]IT07.01.1988
NL07.01.1988
SE31.01.1988
LU30.06.1988
Former [1999/42]IT07.01.1988
NL07.01.1988
SE31.01.1988
Former [1989/21]NL07.01.1988
SE31.01.1988
Former [1989/10]NL07.01.1988
Documents cited:Search[A]DE7729616U  ;
 [A]US2112007  (ADAMS PINKNEY B);
 [A]AT263200B  (SANDHAUS SAMI DR MED [CH]);
 [AD]DE2540077  (KYOTO CERAMIC);
 [AD]DE2615116  (KYOTO CERAMIC);
 [AD]DE2628443  (KYOTO CERAMIC);
 [A]US4229169  (SMITH PETER J, et al);
 [AD]WO8300616  (TATUM O HILT JR);
 [AD]DE3241963  (FELDMUEHLE AG)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.