EP0173802 - Abrasive blasting machine with at least one rotary holding device for workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.12.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.1991 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 12.02.1992 [1992/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEORG FISCHER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Mühlentalstrasse 105 CH-8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [1986/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brenner, Peter Finsterwaldstrasse 24 CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | 02 /
Fiala, Heinrich Stettemerstrasse 26 CH-8207 Schaffhausen / CH | 03 /
Walter, Wolfgang Ottengasse 321 CH-8215 Hallau / CH | [1986/11] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107152.2 | 11.06.1985 | [1986/11] | Priority number, date | CH19840003844 | 10.08.1984 Original published format: CH 384484 | CH19840005805 | 06.12.1984 Original published format: CH 580584 | [1986/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0173802 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173802 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/40] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0173802 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B24C3/08 | [1986/11] | CPC: |
B24C3/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/11] | Title | German: | Schleuderstrahlmaschine mit mindestens einer rotierenden Werkstückaufnahmeeinrichtung | [1986/11] | English: | Abrasive blasting machine with at least one rotary holding device for workpieces | [1986/11] | French: | Machine de traitement au jet abrasif avec au moins un dispositif porte-pièce rotatif | [1986/11] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1985 | Examination requested [1986/11] | 20.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.1988
10.08.1988
ADMISSIBLE BMD Badische Maschinenfabrik Durlach GmbH Pfinztalstrasse 90 D-76227 Karlsruhe / DE Opponent's representative Lichti - Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.1988
10.08.1988
ADMISSIBLE BMD Badische Maschinenfabrik Durlach GmbH Pfinztalstrasse 90 D-76227 Karlsruhe / DE Opponent's representative Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. Jost Lempert Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch Postfach 41 07 60 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1988/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1988
ADMISSIBLE BMD Badische Maschinenfabrik Durlach GmbH Pfinztalstrasse 90 D-76227 Karlsruhe / DE Opponent's representative Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. Jost Lempert Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch Postfach 41 07 60 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | 12.08.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.12.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.01.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 05.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.05.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.05.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.11.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0100944 (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]); | [A]US3852919 (BAUGHMAN D, et al); | [AD]DE2510827 (BADISCHE MASCHF GMBH) |