blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0170012

EP0170012 - Metal-ceramic composite element and process for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.05.1993
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BBC Brown Boveri AG
Haselstrasse
CH-5401 Baden / CH
[1987/36]
Former [1986/06]For all designated states
BBC Aktiengesellschaft Brown, Boveri & Cie.
Haselstrasse
CH-5401 Baden / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Gobrecht, Jens, Dr.
Birchhof 6
CH-5412 Gebenstorf / CH
02 / Neidig, Arno, Dr.
Brühlerweg 42
D-6831 Plankstadt / DE
[1986/06]
Application number, filing date85107213.212.06.1985
[1986/06]
Priority number, dateCH1984000327506.07.1984         Original published format: CH 327584
[1986/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0170012
Date:05.02.1986
Language:DE
[1986/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0170012
Date:12.02.1986
Language:DE
[1986/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0170012
Date:19.04.1989
Language:DE
[1989/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.1985
ClassificationIPC:C04B41/90, C04B37/02
[1986/06]
CPC:
C04B37/025 (EP); C04B37/026 (EP); C04B41/009 (EP);
C04B41/52 (EP); C04B41/89 (EP); C04B2235/6585 (EP);
C04B2237/124 (EP); C04B2237/126 (EP); C04B2237/366 (EP);
C04B2237/368 (EP); C04B2237/407 (EP); C04B2237/54 (EP);
C04B2237/708 (EP); H05K1/0306 (EP); H05K3/38 (EP);
H05K3/388 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
C04B41/009, C04B35/581 (EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/584 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4505, C04B41/5025 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4505, C04B41/5127 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1986/06]
TitleGerman:Metall-Keramik-Verbundelement und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[1986/06]
English:Metal-ceramic composite element and process for its production[1986/06]
French:Elément composite métallo-céramique et procédé pour sa fabrication[1986/06]
Examination procedure24.05.1986Examination requested  [1986/30]
27.03.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.10.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.12.1988Fee for grant paid
28.12.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.01.1990  21.02.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  18.01.1990  21.02.1990  ADMISSIBLE
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [1990/13]
Opponent(s)01  18.01.1990  21.02.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
23.02.1990Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.06.1990Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.06.1990Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
08.10.1990Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
03.09.1991Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.1992Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
23.11.1992Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH30.06.1991
LI30.06.1991
DE01.04.1992
GB12.06.1992
[2015/21]
Former [2002/42]CH30.06.1991
LI30.06.1991
DE01.04.1992
GB12.06.1992
Former [2002/14]CH19.04.1989
LI19.04.1989
DE01.04.1992
GB12.06.1992
Former [1993/47]CH30.06.1991
LI30.06.1991
DE01.04.1992
GB12.06.1992
Former [1993/21]CH30.06.1991
LI30.06.1991
DE01.04.1992
Former [1992/41]CH30.06.1991
LI30.06.1991
DE01.04.1992
Former [1992/16]CH30.06.1991
LI30.06.1991
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP58099183  ;
 [AD]JP59121175  ;
 [XP]EP0123212  ;
 [YD]US3994430  ;
 [A]DE2540015  ;
 [A]EP0097058  ;
 [A]EP0013433  ;
 [A]GB1294695  ;
 [A]US4457958
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 99, Nr. 22, 28. November 1983, Seite 287, Nr. 180491m, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-58 099 183 (HITACHI LTD.) 13.06.1983, & JP58099183 A 00000000
 [AD]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 101, Nr. 24, Dezember 1984, Seite 249, Nr. 215431f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-59 121 175 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 13.07.1984, & JP59121175 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.