blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0170040

EP0170040 - Process and device for the continuous hydrothermal production of sodium silicate solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.1989
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/06]For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jeromin, Lutz, Dr.
Am Bandsbusch 88
D-4010 Hilden / DE
02 / Krings, Heinrich
Zum Stadion 52
D-4018 Langenfeld / DE
03 / Legel, Dieter, Dr.
Ernst-Reuter-Weg 5
D-5657 Haan / DE
04 / Novotny, Rudolf, Dr.
Am Rittersberg 14
D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE
05 / Skrobek, Harald
Senliserstrasse 38
D-4018 Langenfeld / DE
[1986/06]
Application number, filing date85107721.421.06.1985
[1986/06]
Priority number, dateDE1984342394529.06.1984         Original published format: DE 3423945
[1986/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0170040
Date:05.02.1986
Language:DE
[1986/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0170040
Date:26.10.1988
Language:DE
[1988/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.1985
ClassificationIPC:C01B33/32, B01F5/02, B01J8/20
[1986/06]
CPC:
B01J8/20 (EP,US); C01B33/32 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1986/06]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur kontinuierlichen hydrothermalen Herstellung von Natriumsilikatlösungen[1986/06]
English:Process and device for the continuous hydrothermal production of sodium silicate solutions[1986/06]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la production hydrothermale en continu de solutions de silicate de sodium[1986/06]
Examination procedure17.07.1986Examination requested  [1986/38]
29.07.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.05.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.1988Fee for grant paid
04.08.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.07.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Former [1989/39]BE30.06.1989
Documents cited:Search[A]US1763845  (EDGERTON LLOYD B);
 [A]GB461013  (ELECTRIC SMELTING AND ALUMINUM);
 [A]FR2179573  (MADERN JEAN PIERRE [FR]);
 [A]EP0033109  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]);
 [A]EP0066214  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]);
 [A]GB2119779  (UGINE KUHLMANN)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.