EP0170867 - Process for manufacturing a composite material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1989 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.1989 [1989/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vacuumschmelze GmbH Grüner Weg 37 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | For all designated states VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH Grüner Weg 37 Postfach 2253 D-63412 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reppel, Georg Werner, Dipl.-Phys. Goldbergstrasse 4 D-6451 Hammersbach 2 / DE | [1986/07] | Application number, filing date | 85108013.5 | 28.06.1985 | [1986/07] | Priority number, date | DE19843426916 | 21.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3426916 | [1986/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0170867 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0170867 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/04, H01L23/48 | [1986/07] | CPC: |
C22C1/0425 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1986/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Verbundwerkstoffes | [1986/07] | English: | Process for manufacturing a composite material | [1986/07] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un materiau composite | [1986/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/38] | 10.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3685134 (BLUE PHILIP L); | [A]US3969754 (KUNIYA KEIICHI, et al); | [A]GB810678 (HECK FRIEDRICH); | [Y]GB732029 (MALLORY METALLURG PROD LTD); | [Y]GB883429 (MALLORY METALLURG PROD LTD) |