EP0167941 - Differential pressure gauge head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwaier, Arnold, Dipl.-Ing. Hermann-Löns-Weg 28 D-7516 Karlsbad / DE | [1986/03] | Application number, filing date | 85108024.2 | 28.06.1985 | [1986/03] | Priority number, date | DE19843425198 | 09.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3425198 | [1986/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0167941 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0167941 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01L13/02, G01L9/00 | [1988/40] | CPC: |
G01L13/025 (EP);
G01L9/0042 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/03] | G01L13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/03] | Title | German: | Differenzdruck-Messzelle | [1986/03] | English: | Differential pressure gauge head | [1986/03] | French: | Capteur de pression différentielle | [1986/03] | File destroyed: | 15.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 06.04.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/48] | 29.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]EP0115074 ; | [Y]DE7703675U ; | [A]CH186010 ; | [A]GB2065893 ; | [A]EP0059488 ; | [A]DE2659376 |