EP0167944 - Novel polyetherimides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.05.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive P.O. Box 5910-A Chicago Illinois 60680 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive P.O. Box 5910-A Chicago Illinois 60680 / US | ||
Former [1986/03] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matzner, Markus 23 Marshall Drive Edison New Jersey 08817 / US | 02 /
Papuga, Donald Mark 80 Forty Acre Mountain Road Danbury Connecticut 06810 / US | [1986/03] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85108044.0 | 28.06.1985 | [1986/03] | Priority number, date | US19840626102 | 29.06.1984 Original published format: US 626102 | [1986/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0167944 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0167944 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10 | [1986/03] | CPC: |
C08G73/1046 (EP,US);
C08G73/1053 (EP,US);
C08G73/1064 (EP,US);
C08G73/1071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/03] | Title | German: | Polyetherimide | [1986/03] | English: | Novel polyetherimides | [1986/03] | French: | Polyétherimides | [1986/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 10.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.07.1991 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/26] | 14.02.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4444979 (ST CLAIR TERRY L [US], et al); | [A]EP0095174 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |