EP0222925 - Steam dryer for compressed fibrous material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.1990 [1990/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braunschweigische Maschinenbauanstalt AG Am Alten Bahnhof 5 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states Braunschweigische Maschinenbauanstalt AG Am Alten Bahnhof 5 D-38122 Braunschweig / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laske, Gerd In den Wiesen 18 D-3300 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
Valentin, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Amselweg 10 D-6909 Walldorf / DE | [1987/22] | Representative(s) | Döring, Rudolf Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. R. Döring Dipl.-Phys. Dr. J. Fricke Jasperallee 1a D-38102 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | Döring, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. R. Döring Dipl.-Phys. Dr. J. Fricke Jasperallee 1a D-38102 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 85108114.1 | 29.06.1985 | [1987/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0222925 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0222925 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F26B17/04 | [1987/22] | CPC: |
F26B17/08 (EP,US);
F26B21/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/22] | Title | German: | Dampftrockner für abgepresstes faseriges Gut | [1987/22] | English: | Steam dryer for compressed fibrous material | [1987/22] | French: | Séchoir à vapeur pour matériau fibreux essoré | [1987/22] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 24.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU877270 ; | [AD]EP0058651 (SVENSK EXERGITEKNIK AB [SE]); | [A]DE3414853 (KUNZ MASCH APP [CH]); | [A]DE3321178 (IPRO INDUSTRIEPROJEKT GMBH [DE]) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Sektion Mechanik, Woche E35, 13. Oktober 1982, Zusammenfassungsnr. 74224 J08 Q76, Derwent Publications, Ltd., London, GB; & SU - A - 877 270 (POTATO PROD SUPPLY) 30.10.1981, & SU877270 A 00000000 |