Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0170892 | Global Dossier | 24.04.1991 | B1 | EP0170892 | 09.09.1987 | A3 | EP0170892 | 12.02.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US62915284 | 09.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1242690 | 04.10.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US62915284 | 09.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3582626D1 | 29.05.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US62915284 | 09.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8606417 | 16.04.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US62915284 | 09.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU204228 | 30.12.1991 | B | HUT38590 | 30.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US62915284 | 09.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0798844B | 25.10.1995 | B2 | JPS6131405 | 13.02.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US62915284 | 09.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO167094C | 02.10.1991 | C | NO167094B | 24.06.1991 | B | NO852745L | 10.01.1986 | L | Priority number | Date | US62915284 | 09.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10992G | 20.03.1992 | G | Priority number | Date | US62915284 | 09.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4547557 | 15.10.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US62915284 | 09.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA854634 | 26.02.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | US62915284 | 09.07.1984 |