EP0171591 - Storage-stable low-shrinkage curable unsaturated polyester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1996 | Revocation of patent | published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [1989/43] | For all designated states STAMICARBON B.V. P.O. Box 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL | ||
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brassat, Bert, Dr. Bethelstrasse 24 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Walter, Oskar, Dipl.-Ing. Buscher Holzweg 16 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Hess, Bernhard, Dr. Kaldenhausener Strasse 84 D-4130 Moers 2 / DE | [1986/08] | Application number, filing date | 85108423.6 | 08.07.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | DE19843426425 | 18.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3426425 | [1986/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0171591 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0171591 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171591 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/06, C08F299/04 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
C08L67/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/06, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L67/06, C08L67/00, C08L1/10, C08L33/12, C08L31/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/08] | Title | German: | Lagerfähige schwundarm härtbare ungesättigte Polyesterharze | [1986/08] | English: | Storage-stable low-shrinkage curable unsaturated polyester | [1986/08] | French: | Résine de polyester insaturé durcissable à faible retrait et stable au stockage | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 06.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 04.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.1993
23.08.1993
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.1993
23.08.1993
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 29.11.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.05.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.03.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.04.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.04.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.07.1993 | [1995/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2074378 (BP CHEM INT LTD); | [X]CH548434 (REICHHOLD CHEMIE AG); | [X]US3862064 (FRY DAVID PHILIP); | [X]FR2305465 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [X]US4172059 (ATKINS KENNETH E [US], et al) | Examination | US3668178 |