EP0165621 - Locking clamp for fastening devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1990 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. KLIPPAN S.A. Research Park Grauwmeer 1 B-3030 Heverlee-Leuven / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | For all designated states N.V. KLIPPAN S.A. Research Park Grauwmeer 1 B-3030 Heverlee-Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weman, Per Olof Hertogstraat 143 bus 65 B-3030 Heverlee / BE | [1985/52] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 85108628.0 | 19.05.1982 | [1985/52] | Priority number, date | DE19813124190 | 19.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3124190 | [1985/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0165621 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0165621 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0165621 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/18 | [1985/52] | CPC: |
B60R22/34 (EP);
B60R22/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/52] | Title | German: | Sperrbügel für Befestigungsvorrichtungen | [1985/52] | English: | Locking clamp for fastening devices | [1985/52] | French: | Bride de blocage pour dispositifs de fixation | [1985/52] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 24.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP82104375.9 / EP0067965 | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1987 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.1987 | 31.05.1989 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 31.01.1990 | SE | 31.01.1990 | [1999/42] |
Former [1990/34] | SE | 31.01.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2020963 ; | [A]FR2265002 ; | [A]US4149737 ; | [A]US4167277 ; | [A]US3456896 |