EP0172390 - Method and apparatus for rotation rate measurement using a passive optical resonator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.1989 [1989/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LITEF GmbH Lörracher Strasse 18 79115 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states LITEF GmbH Lörracher Strasse 18 D-79115 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states LITEF Litton Techn. Werke der HELLIGE GmbH Lörracher Strasse 18 D-7800 Freiburg/Br. / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Werner, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Mittelweg 22 D-7801 Umkirch / DE | 02 /
Handrich, Eberhard, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Keltenring 104 D-7815 Kirchzarten / DE | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85108685.0 | 11.07.1985 | [1986/09] | Priority number, date | DE19843426868 | 20.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3426868 | [1986/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0172390 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0172390 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0172390 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/36 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
G01C19/727 (EP,US);
G01C19/721 (US);
A63F2300/402 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Drehratenauslesung mittels eines passiven optischen Resonators | [1986/09] | English: | Method and apparatus for rotation rate measurement using a passive optical resonator | [1986/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de mesure de la vitesse angulaire à l'aide d'un résonateur optique passif | [1986/09] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 10.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4135822 (EZEKIEL SHAOUL); | [A]EP0026066 (NORTHROP CORP [US]); | [A]DE2941618 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4408882 (SHEEM SANG K [US]); | [A]US4273444 (POOL ROBERT H, et al) |