EP0170188 - Novel phenothiazines, preparation thereof and use thereof in electrochromic recording systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/06] | Novel phenothiazines and phenoxazines, preparation thereof and use thereof in electrochromic recording systems | ||
[1990/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE HILTON - DAVIS CHEMICAL COMPANY 2235 Langdon Farm Road Cincinnati Ohio / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | For all designated states THE HILTON - DAVIS CHEMICAL COMPANY 2235 Langdon Farm Road Cincinnati Ohio / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gunn, Michael Bernard 6444 Fair Oaks Avenue Cincinnati Ohio / US | 02 /
Hung, William Mo-Wei 9176 Millcliff Drive Cincinnati Ohio / US | [1986/06] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109165.2 | 22.07.1985 | [1986/06] | Priority number, date | US19840636460 | 31.07.1984 Original published format: US 636460 | [1986/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0170188 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0170188 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D279/30, C07D265/38, B41M5/28 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
C07D279/30 (EP,US);
B41M5/20 (EP,US);
C07D265/38 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/06] | C07D279/30, C07D265/38, B41M5/20 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1986/06] | Title | German: | Phenothiazine, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung in elektrochromischen Aufzeichnungsmaterialien | [1990/35] | English: | Novel phenothiazines, preparation thereof and use thereof in electrochromic recording systems | [1990/35] | French: | Phénothiazines, leurs préparation et utilisation dans des matériaux d'enregistrement électrochromique | [1990/35] |
Former [1986/06] | Phenothiazine und Phenoxazine, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung in elektrochromischen Aufzeichnungsmaterialien | ||
Former [1986/06] | Novel phenothiazines and phenoxazines, preparation thereof and use thereof in electrochromic recording systems | ||
Former [1986/06] | Phénothiazines et phénoxazines, leurs préparation et utilisation dans des matériaux d'enregistrement électrochromique | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 13.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 27.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP7352778 ; | [A]US3790376 (HASHIUE M, et al) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 79, no. 23, 10th December 1973, page 386, no. 137172h, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP - A - 73 52 778 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.)24-07-1973, & JP7352778 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 85, no. 1, 5th July 1976, page 449, no. 5573d, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.A. KHUTORNENKO et al.: "Synthesis of phenothiazines. Communication XLII. 3,7-Diamino-10-acetylphenothiazine", & KHIM.-FARM. ZH. 1976, 10(1), 92-7 |