EP0171681 - Speed governor for a fuel injection pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.1989 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1989 [1989/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eheim, Franz Max-Brod-Weg 8 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | 02 /
Straubel, Max, Dr. Ontariostrasse 30B D-7000 Stuttgart 61 / DE | [1986/08] | Application number, filing date | 85109377.3 | 25.07.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | DE19843430295 | 17.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3430295 | [1986/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0171681 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171681 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F02D1/04 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
F02D1/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/08] | Title | German: | Drehzahlregler für Kraftstoffeinspritzpumpen | [1986/08] | English: | Speed governor for a fuel injection pump | [1986/08] | French: | Régulateur de vitesse de rotation pour pompe à injection de combustible | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 07.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3301416 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE1576338 (DRESDEN KRAFTFAHRZEUG VEB); | [A]DE1961874 (SIMMS MOTOR UNITS LTD) |