EP0171686 - Method and device for winding toroidal cores, toroidal coils, toroidal core elements or toroidal coil elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MWB MESSWANDLER-BAU AG Nürnberger Strasse 199 D-96050 Bamberg / DE | [1986/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graul, Otto Erlichstrasse 90 D-8600 Bamberg / DE | 02 /
Dressel, Michael Tempelsgreuth 6 D-8602 Burgebrach / DE | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Hufnagel, Walter, et al Bad Brückenauer Strasse 6 90427 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Hufnagel, Walter, Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., et al Dorner & Hufnagel Patentanwälte Bad Brückenauer Str. 19 D-90427 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109426.8 | 26.07.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | DE19843430055 | 16.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3430055 | [1986/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0171686 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171686 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/08 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
H01F41/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, SE [1986/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bewickeln von Ringkernen, Ringspulen, Ringkernteilen oder Ringspulenteilen | [1986/08] | English: | Method and device for winding toroidal cores, toroidal coils, toroidal core elements or toroidal coil elements | [1986/08] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le bobinage de noyaux toroidaux, de bobines toroidales, de composants de noyaux toroidaux ou de composants de bobines toroidales | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 10.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.09.1988 | FR | 28.09.1988 | SE | 28.09.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [1989/35] | BE | 28.09.1988 | |
SE | 28.09.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | SE | 28.09.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | DE1614712 [ ] (SCHLEIP DR ING SVERRE); | DD149442 [ ] (KONITSCHEK OTTO, et al) |