EP0170232 - Production of composite membranes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.1990 [1990/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sundet, Sherman Archie 2404 Allendale Road Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | [1986/06] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109462.3 | 30.07.1985 | [1986/06] | Priority number, date | US19840635746 | 30.07.1984 Original published format: US 635746 | [1986/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0170232 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0170232 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0170232 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/04, C08G69/26 | [1986/06] | CPC: |
B01D69/12 (EP,US);
B01D71/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/06] | Title | German: | Herstellung von zusammengesetzten Membranen | [1986/06] | English: | Production of composite membranes | [1986/06] | French: | Fabrication de membranes composites | [1986/06] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 20.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5926101 ; | [A]EP0015149 (FILMTEC CORP [US]) |