EP0175104 - Ignition switch for motor vehicles with a combustion engine and starter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1993 | Revocation of patent | published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaltbau Gesellschaft mbH Klausenburger Strasse 6 D-81677 München / DE | For all designated states Daimler-Benz AG Mercedesstrasse 143 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states Schaltbau Gesellschaft mbH Klausenburger Strasse 6 D-81677 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 600202 Mercedesstrasse 136 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1986/13] | For all designated states Schaltbau Gesellschaft mbH Klausenburger Strasse 6 D-81677 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poschet, Klaus, Ing.-grad. Heideweg 32 D-8011 Baldham / DE | [1986/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/47] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1986/13] | Schneider, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Phys. c/o kabelmetal electro GmbH Dipl.-Phys. Wilhelm Schneider Dipl.-Ing. Eberhard Mende Dipl.-Ing. Roger Döring Kabelkamp 20 Postfach 260 D-3000 Hannover 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109555.4 | 30.07.1985 | [1986/13] | Priority number, date | DE19843432257 | 01.09.1984 Original published format: DE 3432257 | [1986/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0175104 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0175104 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0175104 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01H27/06 | [1986/13] | CPC: |
H01H27/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/13] | Title | German: | Fahrtschalter für Kraftfahrzeuge mit Verbrennungsmotor und Anlasser | [1986/13] | English: | Ignition switch for motor vehicles with a combustion engine and starter | [1986/13] | French: | Interrupteur de démarrage pour véhicules à moteur à combustion et démarreur | [1986/13] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 29.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.11.1990
01.03.1991
ADMISSIBLE Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG Wiesenstrasse 47 Postfach 19 69 D-58469 Lüdenscheid / DE | [1991/01] | 06.03.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.05.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.05.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 27.06.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.07.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.08.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3135866 (KIRSTEN ELEKTROTECH [DE]); | [Y]FR2226739 (TAKIGEN MFG CO [JP]); | [Y]FR2402291 (NEIMAN SA [FR]) |