EP0170256 - System for detecting abnormalities in gas engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1991 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Hideaki 2-94, Yamatedai Ohkubo-cho Akashi-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Ozu, Tadahiro 2-8, 2-chome, Kaminotani Suma-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-Ken / JP | 03 /
Fujii, Tatsuo 14-102, 1-2, 1-chome, Ryugadai Suma-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1986/06] | Representative(s) | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich, et al Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109578.6 | 30.07.1985 | [1986/06] | Priority number, date | JP19840118692U | 31.07.1984 Original published format: JP 11869284 U | [1986/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0170256 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0170256 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0170256 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01M15/00 | [1986/06] | CPC: |
G01M15/08 (EP,US);
G01L23/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1986/06] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Feststellung von Abnormalitäten in Gasmotoren | [1986/06] | English: | System for detecting abnormalities in gas engines | [1986/06] | French: | Système pour la détection des anomalies dans des moteurs à gaz | [1986/06] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1985 | Examination requested [1986/06] | 08.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 31.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8202947 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al); | [X]DE3244738 (URACA PUMPEN [DE]) | Examination | - Internal Combustion Engine, vol. 23, no. 293, May 1984 (JP), pages 46-50 |