EP0171707 - Process for the fabrication of polyimide-esters of trimellitic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kricheldorf, Hans Rytger, Professor Dr. Menzelstrasse 10 D-2000 Hamburg 52 / DE | 02 /
Pakull, Ralf, Dipl.-Chem. Memelerstrasse 3 D-2000 Hamburg 70 / DE | 03 /
Dicke, Hans-Rudolf, Dr. Bodelschwinghstrasse 16 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1986/08] | Application number, filing date | 85109633.9 | 31.07.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | DE19843429680 | 11.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3429680 | DE19853504481 | 09.02.1985 Original published format: DE 3504481 | [1986/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0171707 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0171707 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/16 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
C08G73/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyimidestern der Trimellitsäure | [1986/08] | English: | Process for the fabrication of polyimide-esters of trimellitic acid | [1986/08] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de polyimide-esters de l'acide trimellitique | [1986/08] | File destroyed: | 13.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 31.07.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 27.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5867725 ; | [A]GB1093734 (HERBERTS & CO K); | [AD]US3542731 (CULBERTSON BILLY M) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 99, Nr. 22, 28. November 1983, Seite 14, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassungsnr. 176477u, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP - A - 58 67725 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS INC) 22-04-1983, & JP5867725 A 00000000 |