EP0178408 - Device for superposing flat flexible objects, particularly sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.1988 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferag AG CH-8340 Hinwil / CH | [1986/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stauber, Hans-Ulrich Neugutstrasse 15 CH-8624 Grüt / CH | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 85109822.8 | 05.08.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | CH19840004561 | 24.09.1984 Original published format: CH 456184 | [1986/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0178408 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178408 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65H39/043 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
B65H39/043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Übereinanderlegen von biegsamen Flächengebilden, insbesondere von Blättern und Bogen | [1988/06] | English: | Device for superposing flat flexible objects, particularly sheets | [1986/17] | French: | Dispositif pour superposer des objets flexibles plats, en particulier des feuilles et des cahiers | [1986/17] |
Former [1986/17] | Vorrichtung zum Uebereinanderlegen von biegsamen Flächengebilden, insbesondere von Blättern und Bogen | Examination procedure | 12.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 26.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3584865 (MIGNANO FRANK J) |