EP0176702 - Intaglio printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.09.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states Komori Printing Machinery Co., Ltd. 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichikawa, Ieyasu 1521-24, Nougaya-machi Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Arai, Shigeji 13-6, Koganekiyoshigaoka 2-chome Matsudo-shi Chiba / JP | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Kern, Ralf M., et al advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | [2008/41] |
Former [1986/15] | Kern, Ralf M., Dipl.-Ing., et al Ralf M. Kern & Partner Anwaltsbüro Postfach 14 03 29 D-80453 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109832.7 | 05.08.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | JP19840182573 | 03.09.1984 Original published format: JP 18257384 | [1986/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176702 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176702 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B41F9/02, B41F11/02, B41F31/10 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
B41F9/02 (EP,US);
B41F9/00 (KR);
B41F11/02 (EP,US);
B41F31/10 (EP,US);
B41F31/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | Tiefdruckmaschine | [1986/15] | English: | Intaglio printing machine | [1986/15] | French: | Machine d'impression du type hélio | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1985 | Examination requested [1986/15] | 30.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.05.1989
14.06.1989
ADMISSIBLE Orell Füssli Graphische Betriebe AG Dietzingerstrasse 3 CH-8003 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Schachenmann, Beat Patentanwälte E. Blum & Co Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | [1989/27] | 16.06.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.10.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.10.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 25.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.09.1992 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1992/46] | Appeal following opposition | 27.07.1990 | Appeal received No. T0630/90 | 28.08.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.01.1992 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1992/05] | 21.04.1992 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1992/17] | 27.07.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1993/10] | CH | 10.08.1988 | |
LI | 10.08.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | GB626200 [ ] (WILLIAM COLIN NORBURY); | DD110632 [ ]; | DE2411691 [ ]; | EP0091709 [ ] (DE LA RUE GIORI SA [CH]) |