EP0177711 - Position-measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1991 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 D-83292 Traunreut / DE | ||
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Dr. Johannes-Heidenhain-Strasse 5 D-83301 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feichtinger, Kurt Katzwalchen Nr. 26 D-8221 Palling / DE | [1986/16] | Application number, filing date | 85110068.5 | 10.08.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | DE19843437515 | 12.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3437515 | [1986/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177711 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177711 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177711 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/26 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
G01D5/3473 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/16] | Title | German: | Positionsmesseinrichtung | [1986/16] | English: | Position-measuring device | [1986/16] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de position | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1985 | Examination requested [1986/16] | 05.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2525314 (VACTORIC CONTROL EQUIP); | [Y]US4132890 (GARCIA JOE L, et al); | [A]FR2466748 (OLIVETTI & CO SPA [IT]); | [X]US4338517 (PERRINE WARREN L); | [Y]US4343992 (BLASER ANTON J); | [A]EP0100828 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) | [Y] - MESSEN + PRÜFEN/AUTOMATIK, Teil 1, Juni 1974, Seiten 371-374, Hans Holzmann Verlag, Bad Worishofen, DE; Ernst: "Neuere Entwicklungen bei fotoelektrischen Längenmessgeräten" |