EP0193638 - Water closet combination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1989 [1989/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEAL-STANDARD GMBH Postfach 18 09, Euskirchener Strasse 80 D-53008 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/37] | For all designated states IDEAL-STANDARD GMBH Postfach 18 09, Euskirchener Strasse 80 D-53008 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brossardt, Ansgar Ainmillerstrasse 50 D-8000 München 40 / DE | 02 /
Koerner, Arno Ainmillerstrasse 50 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1986/37] | Application number, filing date | 85110072.7 | 10.08.1985 | [1986/37] | Priority number, date | DE19853508019 | 07.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3508019 | [1986/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193638 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0193638 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0193638 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E03D11/02 | [1986/37] | CPC: |
E03D11/02 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1986/37] | Title | German: | Wasserklosettkombination | [1986/37] | English: | Water closet combination | [1986/37] | French: | Water-closet | [1986/37] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 02.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2210796 (CRANE RAYMOND E); | [YD]EP0111225 (IDEAL STANDARD [DE]); | [A]US2845632 (YOUNGSTROM LEONARD W, et al); | [A]US4162548 (BUTLER RONALD N [GB], et al); | [A]US1464398 (AHERN EDMUND L) |