EP0172521 - Method for continuously analysing total gaseous mercury [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1993 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNICAL LABORATORY LTD. 11-17, Kohoku 2-chome Adachi-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNICAL LABORATORY LTD. 11-17, Kohoku 2-chome Adachi-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakao, Shozo 4-744-2, Nakazato Kiyose-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Matsuda, Ichiro 2787, Oazayamada Taishi-cho Minami-kawachi-gun Osaka / JP | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85110109.7 | 12.08.1985 | [1986/09] | Priority number, date | JP19840172791 | 20.08.1984 Original published format: JP 17279184 | [1986/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0172521 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0172521 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0172521 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/00 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
G01N31/005 (EP,US);
G01N21/3103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur fortlaufenden Analyse des gesamten gasförmigen Quecksilbers | [1992/20] | English: | Method for continuously analysing total gaseous mercury | [1986/09] | French: | Méthode pour l'analyse continue de tout le mercure gazeux | [1986/09] |
Former [1986/09] | Verfahren zur fortlaufenden Analyse von total gasförmigem Quecksilber | Examination procedure | 12.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/50] | 30.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3640624 (ANDERSON HOWARD H, et al); | [A]US3711248 (COFFEY P); | [A]US4080169 (KLOOSTERBOER JOHAN G, et al) | [X] - ISA TRANSACTIONS, vol. 13, no. 4, 1974, pages 296-302; HAL B.COOPER, Jr. et al.: "Measurement of mercury vapor concentrations in urban atmospheres" |