blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0173892

EP0173892 - Unloading device for ships [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.1987
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fried. Krupp Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Altendorfer Strasse 103
45143 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/11]For all designated states
Fried. Krupp Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Altendorfer Strasse 103
D-45143 Essen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Krumrey, Alfred, Ing. grad.
Jahnstrasse 10
D-4100 Duisburg 14 / DE
[1986/11]
Application number, filing date85110137.813.08.1985
[1986/11]
Priority number, dateDE1984343245804.09.1984         Original published format: DE 3432458
[1986/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0173892
Date:12.03.1986
Language:DE
[1986/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.1985
ClassificationIPC:B65G67/60
[1986/11]
CPC:
B65G65/20 (EP); B65G67/606 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   FR,   GB,   SE [1986/11]
TitleGerman:Schiffsentlader[1986/11]
English:Unloading device for ships[1986/11]
French:Dispositif de déchargement pour navires[1986/11]
File destroyed:22.06.1993
Examination procedure13.11.1986Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1987/21]
11.12.1986Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1987/21]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchGB2053842  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.