EP0172525 - Process for reducing side lighting during the exposure of reproduction layers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frass, Werner, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Erbsenacker 37 D-6200 Wiesbaden-Naurod / DE | 02 /
Pliefke, Engelbert, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Fritz-Kalle-Strasse 34 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1986/09] | Application number, filing date | 85110174.1 | 14.08.1985 | [1986/09] | Priority number, date | DE19843430712 | 21.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3430712 | [1986/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0172525 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0172525 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/00, G03F7/02 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
G03F7/092 (EP,US);
Y10S430/151 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1990/35] |
Former [1986/09] | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduzierung von Unterstrahlungen bei der Bestrahlung von Reproduktionsschichten | [1986/09] | English: | Process for reducing side lighting during the exposure of reproduction layers | [1986/09] | French: | Procédé pour réduire la diffusion latérale au cours de l'exposition des couches de reproduction | [1986/09] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 27.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 16.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP57165848 ; | [X]US3203805 (MARION BURG); | [X]FR2090380 (OCE VAN DER GRINTEN NV); | [X]EP0068599 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4199649 (YUNDT ALBERT P [US]) | [X] - J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC.: SOLID-STATE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, Band 124, Nr. 10, Oktober 1977, Seiten 1608-1612, Washington, US; D.L. FLOWERS: "Lubrication in photolithography" | [X] - J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC.: SOLID-STATE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, Band 127, Nr. 7, Juli 1980, Seiten 1579-1582, Washington, US; D.L. FLOWERS et al.: ""Lubrication and pattern improvement in photolithography" | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 13, Nr. 4, September 1970, Seite 893, New York, US; R.O. LUSSOW et al.: "Protective coatings for photomask" | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 12, Nr. 11, April 1970, Seite 1765, New York, US; C.B. HUMPHREYS: "Photographic plates" | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 6 (P-167)[1157] 11. Januar 1983; & JP-A-57 165 848 (CANON K.K.) 13-10-1982, & JP57165848 A 00000000 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 18, Nr. 10, März 1976, Seite 3379, New York, US; J.T. GIBNEY et al.: "Release agent method for artwork glass" |