EP0172537 - New electrical insulating oil and oil-filled electrical appliances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1989 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1989 [1989/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 3-1, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 3-1, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Atsushi 15-23, Yakumo 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Endo, Keiji 9-3, Hirasaku 4-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kawakami, Shigenobu 15-10, Yawata 1-chome Ichikawa-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Dohi, Hideyuki 4-7, Tamagawa 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85110282.2 | 16.08.1985 | [1986/09] | Priority number, date | JP19840172240 | 18.08.1984 Original published format: JP 17224084 | [1986/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0172537 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0172537 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/22 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
H01G4/221 (EP,US);
H01B3/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/09] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Isolieröl und ölgefüllte Apparate | [1986/09] | English: | New electrical insulating oil and oil-filled electrical appliances | [1986/09] | French: | Huile isolante et appareils électriques contenant cette huile | [1986/09] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/36] | 23.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1085877 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG); | JPS4939960 [ ] (DAINICHI-NIPPON CABLES, LTD.); | [X]FR2358237 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO [GB]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19751006), vol. 83, no. 14, Database accession no. 118448U, page 265 |