EP0173215 - Method for recovering purified growth hormones from genetically engineered microorganisms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIO-TECHNOLOGY GENERAL CORPORATION 375 Park Avenue, Suite 3303 New York New York 10152 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | For all designated states BIO-TECHNOLOGY GENERAL CORPORATION 375 Park Avenue, Suite 3303 New York New York 10152 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartfeld, Daniel 30 Negba Street Nes Ziona / IL | 02 /
Blumberg, Shmaryahu 8 Habaron Hirsch Street Rishon Le Zion / IL | 03 /
Gorecki, Marian 5 Hanasi Harishon Street Rehovot / IL | 04 /
Hadary, Dan 58 Dror Street Rishon Lezion / IL | 05 /
Zeevi, Menachem 73 Hagilgal Street Ramat Gan / IL | [1986/18] |
Former [1986/10] | 01 /
Bartfeld, Daniel 30 Negba Street Nes Ziona / IL | ||
02 /
Blumberg, Shmaryahu 8 Habaron Hirsch Street Rehovot / IL | |||
03 /
Gorecki, Marian 5 Hanasi Harishon Street Rehovot / IL | |||
04 /
Hadary, Dan 58 Dror Street Rishon Lezion / IL | |||
05 /
Zeevi, Menachem 73 Hagilgal Street Ramat Gan / IL | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85110371.3 | 19.08.1985 | [1986/10] | Priority number, date | US19850734450 | 15.05.1985 Original published format: US 734450 | US19840644435 | 27.08.1984 Original published format: US 644435 | [1986/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0173215 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0173215 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173215 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/02, // C12N15/18 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
C07K14/61 (EP);
C12N15/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1986/10] | C12P21/02, // C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von gereinigten Wachstumshormonen aus genetisch modifizierten Mikro-organismen | [1986/10] | English: | Method for recovering purified growth hormones from genetically engineered microorganisms | [1986/10] | French: | Méthode de récupération d'hormones de croissance purifiées à partir de micro-organismes modifiés par génie génétique | [1986/10] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 04.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 08.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1994/24] | FR | 29.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0114506 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | [APD]EP0131843 (BIO TECHNOLOGY GENERAL CORP [US]); | [E]EP0173280 (BIO TECHNOLOGY GENERAL CORP [US]) | [A] - ENDOCRINOLOGY, vol. 84, no. 2, February 1969, pages 325-331; U.J. LEWIS et al.: "Aggregate-free human growth hormone. I. Isolation by ultrafiltration" | Examination | - J. Chromat. 517 (1990) 57 |