EP0185138 - Radio network for the transmission of information between one pair of a plurality of paired radio stations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/26] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blanschefski, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Prinzenallee 7 D-1000 Berlin 65 / DE | 02 /
Löscher, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. Krontalstrasse 82 D-1000 Berlin 49 / DE | [1986/26] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Hans-Ekhardt Robert Bosch GmbH Geschäftsbereich Elektronik Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Forckenbeckstrasse 9-13 D-14199 Berlin / DE | [1986/26] | Application number, filing date | 85110422.4 | 20.08.1985 | [1986/26] | Priority number, date | DE19843441907 | 16.11.1984 Original published format: DE 3441907 | [1986/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0185138 | Date: | 25.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0185138 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/72 | [1986/26] | CPC: |
H04M1/72511 (EP);
H04M1/73 (EP);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1986/26] | Title | German: | Funknetz zum Übertragen von Informationen zwischen jeweils einem Paar von mehreren Funkstationspaaren | [1986/26] | English: | Radio network for the transmission of information between one pair of a plurality of paired radio stations | [1986/26] | French: | Réseau radio pour la transmission d'informations entre chaque fois une paire de postes parmi plusieurs paires de postes radio | [1986/26] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 20.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 18.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/06] | 12.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5363905 ; | [XP]JP6062747 ; | DE137943 [ ]; | EP0074940 [ ] (PORTAPHONE AG [CH]); | EP0115362 [ ] (PORTENSEIGNE [FR], et al); | FR2544153 [ ] (SONY CORP [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 2, Nr. 99, 17. August 1978, Seite 4877 E 78; & JP-A-53 63 905 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 07-06-1978, & JP5363905 A 00000000 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 197 (E-335)[1920], 14. August 1985; & JP-A-60 62 747 (SANYO DENKI K.K.) 10-04-1985, & JP6062747 A 00000000 |