Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0173237 | Global Dossier | 31.05.1989 | B1 | EP0173237 | 17.09.1986 | A3 | EP0173237 | 05.03.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP12686884 | 21.08.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3570627D1 | 06.07.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP12686884 | 21.08.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6141053U | 15.03.1986 | U | Priority number | Date | JP12686884 | 21.08.1984 |