EP0173917 - Direct-current machine having permanent magnet field system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1990 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abukawa, Toshimi 938-5, Baba-cho Hitachiohta-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Tahara, Kazuo 2-32-13, Nishinarusawa-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Noriyoshi 2-10-9, Moriyama-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Tajima, Fumio 1180-106, Hongo Ishi Jyuoh-machi Taga-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 05 /
Tomite, Tosio 2127-16, Tsuda Katsuta-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1986/11] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85110524.7 | 21.08.1985 | [1986/11] | Priority number, date | JP19840178348 | 29.08.1984 Original published format: JP 17834884 | [1986/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0173917 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173917 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H02K23/04, H02K1/14 | [1986/11] | CPC: |
H02K23/04 (EP,US);
H02K1/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/34] |
Former [1986/11] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Gleichstrommotor mit Permanentmagneterregung | [1986/11] | English: | Direct-current machine having permanent magnet field system | [1986/11] | French: | Moteur à courant continu avec excitation par aimant permanent | [1986/11] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/21] | 27.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0050814 (FANUC LTD [JP]); | [X]GB2110478 (LUCAS IND PLC); | [A]EP0096868 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |