EP0173927 - Process for the manufacture of organic pigments with prominent technical application properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spietschka, Ernst, Dr. Kirchweg 3 D-6270 Idstein/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Urban, Manfred Steigerwaldstrasse 2a D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1986/11] | Application number, filing date | 85110625.2 | 23.08.1985 | [1986/11] | Priority number, date | DE19843432319 | 03.09.1984 Original published format: DE 3432319 | [1986/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0173927 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0173927 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/14 | [1986/11] | CPC: |
C09B67/0017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung organischer Pigmente mit hervorragenden anwendungstechnischen Eigenschaften | [1986/11] | English: | Process for the manufacture of organic pigments with prominent technical application properties | [1986/11] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de pigments organiques ayant des propriétés d'applications techniques remarquables | [1986/11] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 27.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 30.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.05.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2312546 [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]); | EP0075182 [ ] (MOBAY CHEMICAL CORP [US]); | DE1181159 [ ] (ALLIED CHEM); | US3265699 [ ] (JAFFE EDWARD E) |