EP0173955 - A method and device for detecting a specific acoustic spectral feature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imaino, Wayne Isami 396 Jai Drive San Jose California 95119 / US | 02 /
Tam, Andrew Ching 12144 Via Roncole Saratoga California 95070 / US | [1986/11] | Representative(s) | Atchley, Martin John Waldegrave IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Atchley, Martin John Waldegrave IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1986/11] | Lewis, Alan John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 85110806.8 | 28.08.1985 | [1986/11] | Priority number, date | US19840646406 | 04.09.1984 Original published format: US 646406 | [1986/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0173955 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0173955 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173955 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01H3/12, G01H13/00, G01N29/04 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
G01H3/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/11] | G01H3/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Erfassung eines spezifischen spektral-akustischen Merkmales | [1991/11] | English: | A method and device for detecting a specific acoustic spectral feature | [1986/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour détecter une caractéristique spécifique acoustique spectrale | [1986/11] |
Former [1986/11] | Verfahren und Gerät zur Entdeckung eines spezifischen spektral-akustischen Merkmales | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/36] | 23.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.09.1985 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   22.10.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.03.1991 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4119950 (REDDING ROBERT J); | [A]EP0025491 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0049311 (REDDING ROBERT JAMES); | [A]US4391142 (CANTRELL JR JOHN H, et al); | [AD]US4167879 (PEDERSEN NORMAN E); | [AD]US3572099 (WIECZOREK ALFRED B) | [Y] - H.S. BLACK: "Modulation Theory", 1953, chapter 12, pages 181-205, D. Van Nostrand Co., Inc., New York, US; "Frequency modulation" | [A] - OPTICS LETTERS, vol. 5, no. 1, January 1980, pages 15-17, Optical Society of America; G.C. BJORKLUND: "Frequency-modulation spectroscopy: a new method for measuring weak absorptions and dispersions" |