EP0174002 - Means for the pressure regulation of a ventilating system with variable fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fläkt Aktiebolag Sickla Allé 13 S-131 34 Nacka / SE | [1986/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Svensson, Rune J.A. Nyckelpigevägen 1 S-561 49 Huskvarna / SE | [1986/11] | Representative(s) | Siebmanns, Hubertus Götalands Patentbyra AB Egnahemsvägen 2 561 35 Huskvarna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | Siebmanns, Hubertus Götalands Patentbyra AB Egnahemsvägen 2 S-561 35 Huskvarna / SE | Application number, filing date | 85111091.6 | 03.09.1985 | [1986/11] | Priority number, date | SE19840004442 | 05.09.1984 Original published format: SE 8404442 | [1986/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0174002 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0174002 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0174002 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00, F24F11/02, F24F13/14 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
F24F11/0001 (EP);
F24F11/72 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/01] | F24F11/00, F24F11/02, F24F13/14 | ||
Former IPC [1986/11] | F24F13/14, F24F11/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Druckregulierung eines Ventilationssystems mit veränderlichen Flüssen | [1986/11] | English: | Means for the pressure regulation of a ventilating system with variable fluids | [1986/11] | French: | Appareil pour le réglage de la pression d'un système de ventilation mettant en action des courants d'air variables | [1986/11] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 24.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 12.12.1990 | [2003/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1370843 ; | [A]DE1900762U ; | [A]DE1216511 ; | [A]DE1778956 ; | [A]FR2513359 | Examination | DE3128726 |