EP0174590 - Mode switching device in a disc playback device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1992 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | ||
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | ||
Former [1986/12] | For all designated states Nippon Gakki Seizo Kabushiki Kaisha 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamoshita, Yasuhiko c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1991/20] |
Former [1986/12] | 01 /
Kamoshita, Yasuhiko c/o Nippon Gakki Seizo K.K. 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1986/12] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 85111097.3 | 03.09.1985 | [1986/12] | Priority number, date | JP19840139851 | 14.09.1984 Original published format: JP 13985184 | [1986/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0174590 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0174590 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0174590 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11B19/14, G11B17/02 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
G11B17/057 (EP,US);
G11B19/14 (EP,US);
G11B19/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/12] | G11B19/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1986/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Umschaltung der Betriebsfunktion in einem Plattenwiedergabegerät | [1986/12] | English: | Mode switching device in a disc playback device | [1986/12] | French: | Dispositif de changement de mode de fonctionnement dans un lecteur à disque | [1986/12] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/40] | 19.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5857664 ; | [A]EP0063894 (AMLYN CORP [US]); | [A]GB2105091 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]FR2535099 (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2538597 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 146 (P-206)[1291], 25th June 1983; & JP - A - 58 57664 (SANYO DENKI) 05-04-1983, & JP5857664 A 00000000 |